Former Delegate Michael H. Weir, Sr.

District 7


Delegate Michael H. Weir, Sr.
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 8, 1975 to January 8, 2003, representing first District 7 and then District 6, Baltimore and Harford Counties
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
1975-2003
Environmental Matters Committee
1995-2003
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
1984-2003
Joint Committee on Chesapeake Bay Critical Areas (House Chair)
Biographical Information
Born in Highlandtown, Baltimore, Maryland, March 24, 1924
Essex Community College
University of Maryland
Married, six children, ten grandchildren, eight great-grandchildren
Died in Baltimore, Maryland, February 5, 2010

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.