Former Delegate Richard B. Weldon, Jr.

District 3B


Delegate Richard B. Weldon, Jr.
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 8, 2003 to December 17, 2009, representing District 3B, Frederick and Washington Counties. Resigned from the House of Delegates December 17, 2009.
Party Affiliation
Independent
Past House Service
2003-2009
Health and Government Operations Committee
2007-2009
Joint Committee on Federal Relations
2007-2009
Chair, Frederick County Delegation
Biographical Information
Born in Wilmington, Delaware, September 26, 1958
University of Maryland 1989-1991
Served in U.S. Navy, Submarine Service 1976-1980
Married, three children
*Changed party affiliation from Republican Party to unaffiliated September 30, 2008

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.