2007 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 279

File Code: Higher Education
Sponsored By:
Delegates Kaiser, Barkley, Cane, Donoghue, George, Gutierrez, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Kipke, Krebs, Kullen, Manno, Mizeur, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Riley, Ross, and Shewell
Entitled:
Higher Education - Workforce Shortage Student Assistance Grants

Synopsis:

Requiring a recipient of a Workforce Shortage Student Assistance grant to earn a specified number of credit hours in an academic year; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to distribute specified grant awards in specified amounts for a student taking courses during a summer session; authorizing a student who is enrolled in a specified program that requires a mandatory summer academic session to receive an additional award not to exceed $1,000 per calendar year; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

House Action
1/31
First Reading Ways and Means
2/7
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/13
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/15
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
4/1
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/16
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/21
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/1
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/2
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/17
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 594

Sponsored by:

Delegate Anne R. Kaiser, District 14
Delegate Charles Barkley, District 39
Delegate Rudolph C. Cane, District 37A
Delegate John P. Donoghue, District 2C
Delegate Ronald A. George, District 30
Delegate Ana Sol Gutierrez, District 18
Delegate Carolyn J. B. Howard, District 24
Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Susan W. Krebs, District 9B
Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B
Delegate Roger Manno, District 19
Delegate Heather Mizeur, District 20
Delegate Joseline Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate James E. Proctor, Jr., District 27A
Delegate B. Daniel Riley, District 34A
Delegate Justin D. Ross, District 22
Delegate Tanya Shewell, District 5A

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Grants
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Scholarships
Students
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Education
( 18-708 , 18-708 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 285666/01     Offered on: March 13, 2007   at: 10:38 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 164139/01     Offered on: April 5, 2007   at: 11:14 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 15, 2007: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
April 1, 2007: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Senate
April 2, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)