2007 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1006

File Code: Workers' Compensation
Sponsored By:
Delegates Kach, Harrison, Braveboy, Impallaria, Hecht, Manno, McHale, Walkup, Krysiak, Minnick, Burns, Love, J. King, Stifler, and Vaughn
Entitled:
Workers' Compensation - Benefits - Cost of Living Adjustment

Synopsis:

Requiring specified employers to provide a specified annual cost of living adjustment for compensation paid for claims arising from events occurring before a specified date; authorizing specified employers, counties, and municipal corporations to provide a specified annual cost of living adjustment for compensation paid for claims arising from events occurring before a specified date; defining a specified term; providing for the application of the Act; and making the provisions of the Act severable.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

House Action
2/9
First Reading Economic Matters
2/14
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/19
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/20
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
4/4
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/23
First Reading Finance
3/27
Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/1
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/2
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/8
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 446

Sponsored by:

Delegate Wade Kach, District 5
Delegate Aisha N. Braveboy, District 25
Delegate Emmett C. Burns, Jr., District 10
Delegate Hattie N. Harrison, District 45
Delegate Sue Hecht, District 3A
Delegate Rick Impallaria, District 7
Delegate James S. King, District 33A
Delegate Carolyn J. Krysiak, District 46
Delegate Mary Ann E. Love, District 32
Delegate Roger Manno, District 19
Delegate Brian K. McHale, District 46
Delegate Joseph J. Minnick, District 6
Delegate Donna Stifler, District 35A
Delegate Michael L. Vaughn, District 24
Delegate Mary Roe Walkup, District 36

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Business and Economic Development, Department of
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Consumer Price Index
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Publications -see also- Maryland Register
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Workers' Compensation

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Labor and Employment
( 9-638 , 9-638.1 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 703598/02     Offered on: March 22, 2007   at: 11:37 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 227079/01     Offered on: April 5, 2007   at: 6:15 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 20, 2007: Third Reading Passed (135-0)
April 4, 2007: Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Senate
April 2, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)