2007 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 107

File Code: Insurance - Health Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 138
Sponsored By:
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators DeGrange, Garagiola, Hogan, Kasemeyer, Klausmeier, Middleton, Miller, Peters, Rosapepe, Astle, Kelley, and Pugh
Entitled:
Task Force on Health Care Access and Reimbursement

Synopsis:

Establishing the Task Force on Health Care Access and Reimbursement; providing for the membership and duties of the Task Force; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to chair the Task Force and establish specified subcommittees; requiring the Task Force to make specified recommendations and to make specified reports on or before specified dates; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Senate Action
1/22
First Reading Finance
2/7
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/6
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/8
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
4/2
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/9
First Reading Health and Government Operations
3/21
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/29
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/30
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/17
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 505

Sponsored by:

President, The
Administration
Senator John C. Astle, District 30
Senator James E. DeGrange, Sr., District 32
Senator Rob Garagiola, District 15
Senator Patrick J. Hogan, District 39
Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer, District 12
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator Thomas M. Middleton, District 28
Senator Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr., District 27
Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40
Senator Jim Rosapepe, District 21

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Attorney General
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Fees -see also- Devt Fees and Taxes; Reimbursement Rates
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Health Maintenance Organizations -see also- Manage Care Orgs
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Insurance Administration
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset
Uncompensated Care

Bill affects the following Statute:

Health - General
( 19-710.3 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 427472/01     Offered on: March 6, 2007   at: 10:31 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 636588/01     Offered on: April 4, 2007   at: 10:31 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 8, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
April 2, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
House
March 30, 2007: Third Reading Passed (139-0)