2007 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 907

File Code: Primary and Secondary Education
Sponsored By:
Senators Currie, Hogan, and McFadden
Entitled:
Budget Accountability - Master Plans and Evaluations

Synopsis:

Requiring county boards of education to submit specified annual updates to their comprehensive master plans to the State Department of Education on or before specified dates; repealing a provision of law authorizing the State Board of Education to withhold State funds from a county board under specified circumstances; requiring county boards of education to submit comprehensive master plans to the State Department of Education on or before a specified date; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Senate Action
2/22
First Reading Senate Rules
3/2
Re-referred Budget and Taxation
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12
Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/24
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/25
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
4/5
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/23
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/9
Re-referred Ways and Means
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/6
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (104-32)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/27
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c)
of the Maryland Constitution
- Chapter 652

Sponsored by:

Senator Ulysses Currie, District 25
Senator Patrick J. Hogan, District 39
Senator Nathaniel J. McFadden, District 45

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Education, Boards of
Education, Department of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee.
Public Schools
Reports
State Aid
Students

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Education
( 5-401 , 5-401 , 5-402 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 589638/01     Offered on: March 26, 2007   at: 9:09 p.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 375861/01     Offered on: April 9, 2007   at: 9:31 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 25, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
April 5, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
House
April 6, 2007: Third Reading Passed (104-32)