2008 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 154

File Code: Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 545
Sponsored By:
Senator Colburn
Entitled:
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2008

Synopsis:

Repealing the off-sale privilege of a Class B beer and light wine license in Dorchester County on or after July 1, 2008; authorizing a holder of a Class B (on-sale and off-sale) beer and light wine license that is issued on or before June 30, 2008, to continue to exercise the privileges of the license and to renew the license; providing penalties for violations at catered events; authorizing a license for specified not for profit organizations; clarifying and altering the hours of sale for specified licenses; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occuring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
1/18
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
1/30
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2/19
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2/21
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
4/2
Returned Passed
House Action
2/22
First Reading Economic Matters
3/25
Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/31
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
4/1
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/22
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 564

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Dorchester County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties
Restaurants

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Article - 2B Alcoholic Beverages
( 5-201 , 6-201 , 7-101 , 7-101 , 9-102 , 11-510 , 11-510 , 11-510 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Attorney General Letter (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 764633/01     Offered on: February 19, 2008   at: 10:51 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
February 21, 2008: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
House
April 1, 2008: Third Reading Passed (140-0)