2008 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 139

File Code: Primary and Secondary Education Prior Year Introduction As: HB 639/07 - W&M Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 582
Sponsored By:
Delegates Stukes, Ali, Anderson, Cane, Conaway, Glenn, Harrison, Haynes, McDonough, McIntosh, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Rice, Robinson, Rosenberg, Tarrant, and Walker
Entitled:
Task Force to Study Issues Related to Students Subject to Multiple Suspensions

Synopsis:

Establishing a Task Force to Study Issues Related to Students Subject to Multiple Suspensions; establishing the membership, duties, and designation of the chair of the Task Force; requiring that the Task Force study and report on the feasibility and the fiscal impact of mandating that local school systems throughout the State establish student services teams to provide case management to students who incur one or more suspensions in a school year that result in the student's absence for 10 or more school days; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occuring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/18
First Reading Ways and Means
1/23
Hearing 2/5 at 11:00 a.m.
3/22
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/19
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/20
Third Reading Passed (121-15)
4/4
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (130-8)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/22
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/3
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/3
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-13)
Action after passage in House and Senate
4/24
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 252

Sponsored by:

Delegate Melvin L. Stukes, District 44
Delegate Saqib Ali, District 39
Delegate Curt Anderson, District 43
Delegate Rudolph C. Cane, District 37A
Delegate Frank M. Conaway, Jr., District 40
Delegate Cheryl D. Glenn, District 45
Delegate Hattie N. Harrison, District 45
Delegate Keith E. Haynes, District 44
Delegate Pat McDonough, District 7
Delegate Maggie McIntosh, District 43
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Craig L. Rice, District 15
Delegate Barbara Robinson, District 40
Delegate Samuel I. Rosenberg, District 41
Delegate Shawn Z. Tarrant, District 40
Delegate Jay Walker, District 26

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Discipline
Language
Notices
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Reports
Social Services -see also- Welfare
Students
Sunset

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 785664/01     Offered on: March 22, 2008   at: 12:19 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 214633/01     Offered on: April 5, 2008   at: 1:40 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 20, 2008: Third Reading Passed (121-15)
April 4, 2008: Third Reading Passed (130-8)
Senate
April 3, 2008: Third Reading Passed (34-13)