2009 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1263

File Code: Environment Prior Year Introduction As: HB 835/08 - ENV
Sponsored By:
Delegates Hucker, O'Donnell, Shewell, and Manno
Entitled:
Mercury Switch Removal from Vehicles

Synopsis:

Requiring motor vehicle manufacturers, individually or as a group, to develop and submit to the Department of the Environment by September 30, 2009, a mercury minimization plan that includes information on mercury switch removal from motor vehicles; establishing requirements for a mercury minimization plan; requiring vehicle manufacturers to pay specified costs associated with mercury switch removal; authorizing the Department to approve, disapprove, or conditionally approve the plan within 90 days after receipt; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/13
First Reading Environmental Matters
Hearing 3/6 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/25
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/26
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
4/10
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/28
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/31
Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/8
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/9
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 713

Sponsored by:

Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Roger P. Manno, District 19
Delegate Anthony J. O'Donnell, District 29C
Delegate Tanya T. Shewell, District 5A

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties; Sentences; etc.
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn.
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Notices
Penalties
Pollution -see also- Sediment Control
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Recycling
Refuse Disposal -see also- Recycling
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees & Taxes; specific tax.
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Sunset
Wreckers and Scrap Processors

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Environment
( 6-904 , 6-905 , 6-905.4 , 6-905.5 , 6-905.6 , 19-1707 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Attorney General Letter (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 130711/01     Offered on: March 28, 2009   at: 11:46 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 934936/01     Offered on: April 13, 2009   at: 1:51 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 26, 2009: Third Reading Passed (134-0)
April 10, 2009: Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Senate
April 9, 2009: Third Reading Passed (44-3)