2010 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 868

File Code: Health Occupations Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 163
Sponsored By:
Delegates Montgomery, Carr, Frick, George, Heller, Howard, and Manno
Entitled:
State Board of Pharmacy - Wholesale Distributor Permitting and Prescription Drug Integrity Act - Revisions

Synopsis:

Authorizing the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to purchase and distribute specified drugs and devices for specified purposes; requiring the Department to adopt regulations, in consultation with the State Board of Pharmacy, for specified purposes; altering the circumstances under which the Board may grant "deemed status" to wholesale distributors; requiring wholesale distributors that receive a permit by reciprocity to comply with specified requirements; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/10
First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/24
Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/17
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/19
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
4/3
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/22
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/31
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/1
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/4
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 240

Sponsored by:

Delegate Karen S. Montgomery, District 14
Delegate Alfred C. Carr, Jr., District 18
Delegate C. William Frick, District 16
Delegate Ron George, District 30
Delegate Henry B. Heller, District 19
Delegate Carolyn J. B. Howard, District 24
Delegate Roger P. Manno, District 19

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Bonds -see also- County & Baltimore City Bonds; State Bonds.
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Criminal Background Investigations
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Interstate Affairs
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers` Licenses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Rules and Regulations

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Health Occupations
( 12-6C-01 , 12-6C-01 , 12-6C-01 , 12-6C-01 , 12-6C-01 , 12-6C-01 , 12-6C-03. , 12-6C-04 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 276087/01     Offered on: March 17, 2010   at: 10:54 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 934035/01     Offered on: April 2, 2010   at: 12:34 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Health and Government Operations
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 19, 2010: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
April 3, 2010: Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Senate
April 1, 2010: Third Reading Passed (47-0)