2010 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 854

File Code: Criminal Law - Procedure Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 936
Sponsored By:
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators DeGrange, Haines, King, Muse, Robey, Stone, Brochin, Jacobs, Mooney, Raskin, Simonaire, Astle, Conway, Currie, Della, Dyson, Exum, Garagiola, Glassman, Harrington, Jones, Kasemeyer, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lenett, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Munson, Peters, Pugh, and Rosapepe
Entitled:
Crimes - Sex Offenders - Notification, Registration, and Penalties

Synopsis:

Increasing the maximum and mandatory minimum penalties for a person convicted of rape in the second degree of a child under the age of 13 years; increasing the maximum and mandatory minimum penalties for a person convicted of a sexual offense in the second degree against a child under the age of 13 years; altering requirements relating to the registration on a specified registry of individuals who have committed specified sex offenses; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
2/12
First Reading Senate Rules
2/19
Re-referred Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/25
Favorable with Amendments
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Substitute Committee Amendment Adopted
Special Order 3/26 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
3/26
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Favorable Report Adopted
Floor Committee Amendment (Judicial Proceedings) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Rejected
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/27
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
4/3
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Senate Requests House Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Senators Brochin, Haines, and Raskin
4/9
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
4/8
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/26
First Reading Judiciary
3/30
Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/29
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/30
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
4/1
House Refuses to Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Delegates Dumais, Waldstreicher, and Frank
4/8
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/4
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 174

Sponsored by:

President, The
Administration
Senator John C. Astle, District 30
Senator James Brochin, District 42
Senator Joan Carter Conway, District 43
Senator Ulysses Currie, District 25
Senator James E. DeGrange, Sr., District 32
Senator George W. Della, Jr., District 46
Senator Roy P. Dyson, District 29
Senator Nathaniel Exum, District 24
Senator Rob Garagiola, District 15
Senator Barry Glassman, District 35
Senator Larry E. Haines, District 5
Senator David C. Harrington, District 47
Senator Nancy Jacobs, District 34
Senator Verna L. Jones, District 44
Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer, District 12
Senator Nancy J. King, District 39
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator Rona E. Kramer, District 14
Senator Mike Lenett, District 19
Senator Richard S. Madaleno, Jr., District 18
Senator Nathaniel J. McFadden, District 45
Senator Thomas M. Middleton, District 28
Senator Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr., District 27
Senator Alexander X. Mooney, District 3
Senator Donald F. Munson, District 2
Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator James N. Robey, District 13
Senator Jim Rosapepe, District 21
Senator Bryan W. Simonaire, District 31
Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr., District 6

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Attorney General
Child Care
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Computers -see also- Electronic Commerce; Electronic Govmnt.
Correction, Division of
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans`; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Evidence
Examinations
Ex-Offenders
Genetics
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Identification
Indigent Persons
International Affairs -see also- Foreign Trade
Interstate Affairs
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Local Government Mandates
Mental Health
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Schools
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State Hospitals
State`s Attorneys
Telecommunications -see also- Telephones
Trials
Witnesses

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Criminal Law
( 3-304 , 3-306 )
Criminal Procedure
( 11-701 , 11-702 , 11-702.1 , 11-703 , 11-704 , 11-704.1 , 11-704.2 , 11-705 , 11-706 , 11-707 , 11-708 , 11-709 , 11-710 , 11-712 , 11-713 , 11-714 , 11-717 , 11-718 , 11-721 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Attorney General Letter: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 448670/02     Offered on: March 25, 2010   at: 12:10 p.m.     Status: Withdrawn
Number: 448670/04     Offered on: March 25, 2010   at: 12:11 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 613525/01     Offered on: March 26, 2010   at: 11:46 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 678573/01     Offered on: March 26, 2010   at: 11:46 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 893929/01     Offered on: March 26, 2010   at: 11:48 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 482417/01     Offered on: April 5, 2010   at: 8:27 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Conference Committee Documents::
Report Number: 133123/1     Offered on: April 12, 2010   at: 10:08 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Amendment Number: 833421/2     Offered on: April 12, 2010   at: 10:08 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
Senate
Judicial Proceedings
House
Judiciary
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 27, 2010: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
April 9, 2010: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
House
March 30, 2010: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
April 8, 2010: Third Reading Passed (141-0)