2010 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 103

File Code: Real Property Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 235
Sponsored By:
Delegates Lafferty and Malone
Entitled:
Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Plans for Dislocated Residents

Synopsis:

Requiring that a copy of a written notice of termination be sent to the local governing body of a county or municipal corporation if the use of land of a mobile home park is to be changed; applying statewide the provision that, if a mobile home park owner does not submit a relocation plan with an application for a change in the land use of a park or does not comply with an approved plan, the application may not be approved until the owner complies; specifying provisions for a park with more than 38 sites; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/15
First Reading Environmental Matters
1/22
Hearing 2/4 at 2:00 p.m.
1/26
Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/21
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/22
Third Reading Passed (115-25)
3/31
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
House Requests Senate Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Delegates Holmes, Glenn, and Sossi
4/5
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (102-27)
4/7
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/25
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/31
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/1
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-13)
4/4
Senate Refuses to Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Senators Raskin, Gladden, and Muse
4/7
Conference Committee Report Adopted (37-10)
Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/4
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 259

Sponsored by:

Delegate Stephen W. Lafferty, District 42
Delegate James E. Malone, Jr., District 12A

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Landlord and Tenant -see also- Eviction; Leases & Rent; etc.
Leases and Rent
Mobile Homes
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Notices
Zoning and Planning

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Real Property
( 8A-202 , 8A-1201 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Attorney General Letter: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 600913/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 10:35 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 258271/01     Offered on: April 2, 2010   at: 11:56 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Conference Committee Documents::
Report Number: 543927/1     Offered on: April 12, 2010   at: 12:25 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Amendment Number: 473423/2     Offered on: April 12, 2010   at: 12:25 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Environmental Matters
Senate
Judicial Proceedings
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 22, 2010: Third Reading Passed (115-25)
April 5, 2010: Third Reading Passed (102-27)
Senate
April 1, 2010: Third Reading Passed (34-13)
April 7, 2010: Conference Committee Report {543927/1 Adopted (37-10)
April 7, 2010: Third Reading Passed (37-10)