2011 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 906

File Code: Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Sponsored By:
Senator Mathias
Entitled:
Worcester County - Department of Liquor Control - Wine and Liquor Purchasing Option

Synopsis:

Abolishing the Liquor Control Board for Worcester County and replacing it with the Worcester County Department of Liquor Control; specifying that the Department is a department of the county government; authorizing an alcoholic beverages licensee in the county, beginning on May 1, 2016, to elect to purchase wine or liquor from a licensed wholesaler in addition to or instead of from the Department; requiring the licensee to provide notice to the Department with specified information; repealing a specified minimum price; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
2/21
First Reading Senate Rules
2/28
Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/2
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18

Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/22
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
4/5
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/20
First Reading Economic Matters
4/7
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/3
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/4
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/10
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 304

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Annotated Code of Maryland
County Commissioners
Legislative Services, Department of
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Worcester County

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Article - 2B Alcoholic Beverages
( 6-201 , 6-201 , 6-301 , 6-301 , 6-401 , 6-401 , 8-224 , 8-224 , 8-603 , 15-201 , 15-201 , 15-201 , 15-201 , 15-201 , 15-201 , 15-201 , 15-201 , 15-201 , 15-202 , 15-204 , 15-205 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 154537/01     Offered on: March 18, 2011   at: 11:46 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 863990/01     Offered on: April 7, 2011   at: 12:01 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
House
Economic Matters
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 22, 2011: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
April 5, 2011: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
House
April 4, 2011: Third Reading Passed (137-0)