About Agendas

The Senate and House Agendas include all scheduled calendars. Additional calendars, messages. or other items may be added to the Agenda during the daily session and may not always appear on the Agenda displayed here.

The Secretary of the Senate prepares a legislative calendar or agenda each day reflecting the matters to be considered during the floor session. The agenda includes committee reports, bills that have been “laid over” or “special ordered” from a prior session, bills on third reading, and other items of interest.

In the House of Delegates, the Office of the Chief Clerk prepares individual calendars for each committee report, bills on third reading, or other items of legislative business to be considered at the floor session.



Related Links


2017 Regular Session Proceedings:


Senate Agenda

View House Agenda
FEBRUARY 26, 2018 - SESSION 1
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee Report No. 14
Distribution Date: February 23, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 26, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 18
(Emergency Bill)
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Waugh
Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Private Career Schools
SB 470
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Salling
Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Certificate and License Programs
SB 477
(Emergency Bill)
Favorable Senator Kagan
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone Numbers
SB 509
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Waugh
Community Colleges - Veterans Advisors and Veterans Resource Centers - Established
SB 608
Favorable President
State House Trust - Duties - Maintenance of Lawyer's Mall
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
SB 15
(Emergency Bill)
Unfavorable Senator Kagan
Health Occupations - Certified Associate Counselors-Alcohol and Drug and Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - Qualifications
Top
FEBRUARY 27, 2018 - SESSION 1
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee Report No. 15
Distribution Date: February 26, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 27, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 496
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Ready
Environment - Greywater - Residential Use
SB 500
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
SB 540
Favorable Senator Edwards
Garrett County - Bids and Contracts
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
SB 398
Unfavorable Senator Conway
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Protest of License Renewal
SB 884
Unfavorable Senator Middleton
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Class D License - Transfer
SB 959
Unfavorable Senator Edwards
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears
UNFAVORABLE
SB 314
Unfavorable President
Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018)
Top
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee Report No. 16
Distribution Date: February 26, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 27, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 49
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Simonaire
Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - Salary
SB 256
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Pinsky
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
SB 474
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Benson
Ethics - Local Public Ethics Commissions and Entities - Meeting and Reporting Requirements
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
SB 409
Unfavorable Senator Robinson
Task Force to Study the Residential Environment of Seniors in Baltimore City
SB 737
Unfavorable Senator Robinson
State Finance and Procurement - State-Funded Entities - Diversity in Advertising
Top
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee Report No. 17
Distribution Date: February 26, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 27, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 676
Favorable Senator Conway
Baltimore City - Community Benefits Districts
SB 843
Favorable Senator Conway
State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Guaranty Fund - Fund Transfer
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
SB 586
Unfavorable Senator Robinson
Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Certificate and License Programs
Top
Judicial Proceedings Committee Report No. 9
Distribution Date: February 26, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 27, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 268
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Lee
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Farm Equipment, Farm Tractors, and Animal-Drawn Vehicles
SB 475
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Middleton
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
SB 486
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Edwards
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
SB 491
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Kelley
Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective Orders
SB 648
Favorable Senator Kelley
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
SB 962
Unfavorable Senator Hough
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
UNFAVORABLE
SB 56
Unfavorable Senator Norman
Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property
SB 109
Unfavorable Senator Reilly
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Parent - Repeal
Top
Judicial Proceedings Committee Report No. 10
Distribution Date: February 26, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 27, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 296
Favorable with Amendments (2) President
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2018)
SB 316
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Lee
Criminal Law - Continuing Course of Conduct With a Child - Unit of Prosecution
SB 598
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Lee
Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products
SB 726
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Zirkin
Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
SB 446
Unfavorable Senator Astle
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
UNFAVORABLE
SB 265
Unfavorable Anne Arundel County Senators
Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and Release
SB 376
Unfavorable Senator Lee
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware
SB 617
Unfavorable Senator Robinson
Criminal Procedure - Sentencing - Primary Caretaker
Top
Budget and Taxation Committee Report No. 5
Distribution Date: February 26, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 27, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 275
Favorable Carroll County Senators
Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
SB 400
Favorable Senator Conway
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund
SB 429
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Bates
Property Tax Credit - Widow or Widower of Veteran
SB 480
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Ferguson
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority - Distribution of Local Impact Grants
SB 502
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Smith
Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment Funds
SB 742
Favorable Senator Madaleno
Income Tax - Wynne Case - Local Government Repayments to the Local Reserve Account
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
SB 750
Unfavorable Senator Simonaire
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Lake Shore Athletic Complex
SB 1119
Unfavorable Senator Simonaire
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Tick Neck Park Recreational Obstacle Course
Top
Finance Committee Report No. 14
Distribution Date: February 26, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 27, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 690
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Benson
Maryland Department of Health - Basic Health Program - Implementation
SB 878
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Feldman
Health Insurance - Medicaid Buy-In Task Force
UNFAVORABLE
SB 288
Unfavorable Senator Feldman
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility Program
Top

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 24, 2018 5:30 AM