About Agendas

The Senate and House Agendas include all scheduled calendars. Additional calendars, messages. or other items may be added to the Agenda during the daily session and may not always appear on the Agenda displayed here.

The Secretary of the Senate prepares a legislative calendar or agenda each day reflecting the matters to be considered during the floor session. The agenda includes committee reports, bills that have been “laid over” or “special ordered” from a prior session, bills on third reading, and other items of interest.

In the House of Delegates, the Office of the Chief Clerk prepares individual calendars for each committee report, bills on third reading, or other items of legislative business to be considered at the floor session.



Related Links


2018 Regular Session Proceedings:


Senate Agenda

View House Agenda
FEBRUARY 22, 2018 - SESSION 1
Distribution Date: February 21, 2018
Third Reading Date: February 22, 2018
Senate Third Reading Calendar No. 24 (General Senate Bills)
SB 107
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
Judicial Proceedings
Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements
SB 161
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines
SB 170
Senator Lee
Judicial Proceedings
Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
SB 217
Senator Young
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Schools - Student Sunscreen Use - Policy
SB 297
President
Judicial Proceedings
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human Trafficking
SB 350
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
SB 402
Senator Zucker
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and Consent
SB 436
Caroline County Senators
Judicial Proceedings
Caroline County and Kent County – Sheriff Salary
Top
Distribution Date: February 21, 2018
Third Reading Date: February 22, 2018
Senate Third Reading Calendar No. 25 (General Senate Bills)
SB 372
Senator Kasemeyer
Budget and Taxation
Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees
SB 380
Senator King
Budget and Taxation
Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
SB 381
Senator King
Budget and Taxation
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance
SB 383
Senator Benson
Budget and Taxation
Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension
SB 397
Senator Astle
Finance
Public Utilities - Apartment Houses and Commercial Buildings - Service Charges
SB 420
Senator Robinson
Budget and Taxation
Commission to Study Compliance by State Gaming Facility Licensees With the State Minority Business Enterprise Program
SB 428
Senator Bates
Budget and Taxation
Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
SB 574
Senator Klausmeier
Finance
Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
SB 891
President
Finance
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Top
FEBRUARY 23, 2018 - SESSION 1
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee Report No. 13
Distribution Date: February 22, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 23, 2018
FAVORABLE
SJ 6
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Eckardt
Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Top
Finance Committee Report No. 13
Distribution Date: February 22, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 23, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 137
(Emergency Bill)
Favorable with Amendments (3) Senator Reilly
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
SB 476
Unfavorable Senator Klausmeier
Dispensing of Naloxone - Hospital Emergency Departments - Registered Nurses
UNFAVORABLE
SB 513
Unfavorable Senator Waugh
Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition
Top

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 22, 2018 5:30 AM