About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published May 17, 2018


May 18 May 22

Issued: May 18, 2018

MARYLAND MEDICAID ADVISORY COMMITTEE - Addendum Number: 18-2

   THURSDAY    MAY 24, 2018

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room L-3
                                     to          Lobby Level Conference Room
                                  3:00 P.M.      Department of Health
                                                 201 W. Preston Street
                                                 Baltimore, MD

    Subject:  To Be Announced

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Carrol Barnes, Maryland Department of
      Health
              Telephone: 410-767-5213

NATALIE M LAPRA MD MED CANN COMM FULL COMM - Addendum Number: 18-1

   THURSDAY    MAY 24, 2018

                                  2:00 P.M.      Harford County
                                     to          Council Chambers
                                  4:00 P.M.      212 S. Bond Street
                                                 Bel Air, MD

   NOTE   Location Change

    Subject:  Votes on dispensary licenses, an independent testing laboratory
              registration, and changes to regulations.  Some standing
              committees will be reporting.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Mary-Jo Mather, Maryland Medical Cannabis
      Commission
              Telephone: 410-487-8052

NATALIE M. LAPRADE MD MEDICAL CANNABIS COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 18-2

   THURSDAY    MAY 24, 2018

                                  12:30 P.M.     Harford County
                                      to         Council Chambers
                                   2:00 P.M.     212 S. Bond Street
                                                 Bel Air, MD

   NOTE   Location Change

    Subject:  Potential revisions to the Commission's regulations

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Mary-Jo Mather, Maryland Medical Cannabis
      Commission
              Telephone: 410-487-8052

Issued: May 22, 2018

LEGISLATIVE ETHICS, JOINT COMMITTEE ON - Addendum Number: 18-2

   WEDNESDAY   MAY 23, 2018

                                  9:30 A.M.      Room UL1
                                                 Judicial College
                                                 Education and Conference Center
                                                 2011D Commerce Park Drive
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Time and Location Change

    Subject:  Review of Disclosures and Disclaimers

              Work Session

              A portion of the meeting may be closed to comply with a statutory
              requirement that prevents public disclosure of matters that may be
              discussed.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Deadra W. Daly, Dept. of Legislative
      Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5200 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5200 (Washington, D.C. Area)



May 22, 2018 2:45 P.M.