About Proceedings

Both chambers hold their sessions in the morning, except for Monday when floor sessions convene at 8:00 p.m. On Tuesday through Thursday, session begins at 10:00 a.m. On Friday, the Senate and the House usually convene around 11:00 a.m. except during the final weeks of session when the schedule reverts to 10:00 a.m. on Friday. Additional late afternoon, night, and weekend sessions are sometimes required by both houses.

House Order of Business:

  1. Call to order.
  2. Reading of the journal.
  3. Presentation of petitions, memorials, and other papers.
  4. Presentation of orders.
  5. Introduction of bills and resolutions.
  6. Introduction of House Resolutions.
  7. Unfinished business.
  8. Reports of standing committees.
  9. Reports of select committees.
  10. Laid over bills.
  11. Special orders of the day.
  12. Third reading calendars.
  13. Introduction of visitors.
  14. Adjournment.


Related Links


2018 Regular Session Proceedings:


House Agenda for Proceedings No. 70

Proceedings
APRIL 9, 2018 - SESSION 5
April 9, 2018
Message from the Senate: Yeas and Nays No. 19
House Bills Passed In The Senate
HB 24
Delegate Jackson
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - Establishment
HB 110
St. Mary's County Delegation
St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
HB 114
Delegate McIntosh
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 Licenses
HB 183
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County Environmental Justice Commission PG 411-18
HB 373
Cecil County Delegation
Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs
HB 547
Delegate Barron
Education – Head Start Program – Annual Appropriation (The Ulysses Currie Act)
HB 653
Delegate Young, K.
Health Care Providers - Opioid and Benzodiazepine Prescriptions - Discussion of Benefits and Risks
HB 727
Calvert County Delegation
State Designations - State Paleontology Collection and Research Center - Calvert Marine Museum
HB 905
Delegate Ali
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Reissuance of Licenses (Community Liquor Empowerment Act of 2018)
HB 913
Delegate Miller, A.
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions
HB 946
Delegate Kramer
Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse
HB 968
Delegate Barnes, B.
Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
HB 1029
Delegate Branch
Criminal Law – Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Loaded Handgun – Subsequent Offender
HB 1042
Delegate Barnes, B.
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefit Cap Increase
HB 1103
(Emergency Bill)
Delegate Hettleman
Higher Education – Private Career Schools, For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education, and For–Profit Online Distance Education Programs – Regulation
HB 1141
Delegate Jacobs
Building Performance Standards - Agricultural Buildings Used for Agritourism - Exemption
HB 1216
Delegate Clippinger
Career Preparation Expansion Act
HB 1247
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation
HB 1292
Delegate Lierman
Criminal Law – Law Enforcement – Prohibition on Sexual Activity
HB 1310
Delegate Ghrist
Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Credentialing Practices
HB 1368
Delegate McMillan
Grounds for Divorce - 12-Month Separation - Oral Amendment to Application for Divorce
HB 1448
Delegate Vallario
Clerks of the Courts - Traffic Fines - Installment Payments
HB 1506
Delegate Kramer
Office of the Attorney General - Securities Commissioner - Asset Recovery for Exploited Seniors
HB 1685
Delegate Jones
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)
HB 1696
Delegate Reznik
Task Force to Study Access to Home Health Care for Children and Adults With Medical Disabilities and Report on Home– and Community–Based Services
HB 1717
(Emergency Bill)
Delegate Wilkins
State Government - Protection of Information - Voter Registration Numbers
HB 1766
Delegate Bromwell
Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program - Sunset Extension and Repeal of Subsidy for Medicare Part D Coverage Gap
HB 1794
Delegate Kaiser
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
HB 1819
Delegate Jackson
Higher Education – Cyber Warrior Diversity Program – Established
Top
April 10, 2018
Message from the Senate: Yeas and Nays No. 20
House Bills Passed In The Senate
HB 36
Delegate Jackson
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
HB 694
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
Public Safety - Building Codes - Transfer of Administration to Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation
HB 1209
Delegate Proctor
Public Safety – Missing Persons – Information (Eula and Danny’s Law)
HB 1280
Delegate Korman
Maryland Department of Health – Enrollees in the Employed Individuals with Disabilities Program – Demonstration Program
HB 1593
Delegate Sample-Hughes
Real Property – Mobile Home Parks – Notices to Residents
HB 1682
Delegate Morales
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
Top
Environment and Transportation Committee Report No. 24
Distribution Date: April 9, 2018
Second Reading Date: April 9, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 558
Favorable with Amendments Senator Simonaire
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Top
Health and Government Operations Committee Report No. 27
Distribution Date: April 9, 2018
Second Reading Date: April 9, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 211
Favorable Senator Waugh
Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Top
April 9, 2018
Special Order Calendar No. 55
SB 183
Senator Simonaire
STATUS: (Environment and Transportation)
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Recreational License Donation Fund - Donations



CALENDAR #31
Motion by Del. Clippinger to make Bill a Special Order of Business for Monday at the appropriate time. CARRIED.

BILL ON 3RD READING.


Top
April 9, 2018
Special Order Calendar No. 56
SB 555
Senator Hough
STATUS: (Environment and Transportation)
Safe Neighborhoods Act



CALENDAR #55
Motion by Del. Beidle to make Bill a Special Order of Business for Monday at the appropriate time. CARRIED.

BILL ON 3RD READING.


Top
April 9, 2018
Special Order Calendar No. 58
SB 1165
Senator Waugh
STATUS: (Health and Government Operations)
Procurement – Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation



Favorable Report NOT ADOPTED.

Motion by Delegate Bromwell to make Bill a Special Order of Business for Monday at the appropriate time. CARRIED.

BILL ON 2ND READING.


Top
April 9, 2018
Special Order Calendar No. 59
SB 1249
Senator Rosapepe
STATUS: (Environment and Transportation)
Prince George's County - Reduction in and Exemptions From the School Facilities Surcharge - Sunset Extension



CALENDAR #66
Motion by Delegate A. Washington to make Bill a Special Order of Business for Monday at the appropriate time. CARRIED.

BILL ON 3RD READING.


Top
April 1, 2018
Calendar of Third Reading Senate Bills No. 62
SB 171
Senator Eckardt
Ways and Means
Talbot County Board of Education - Start Date of Term for Members
SB 204
Senator Simonaire
Ways and Means
Higher Education - Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program
SB 275
Carroll County Senators
Ways and Means
Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
SB 333
(Amended)
Senator Simonaire
Ways and Means
Election Law - Voting - Ballot Request and Canvassing Procedures
SB 359
Carroll County Senators
Ways and Means
Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative
SB 735
Carroll County Senators
Ways and Means
Carroll County - Board of Education - Compensation
SB 961
Calvert County Senators
Ways and Means
Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
SB 1162
Washington County Senators
Ways and Means
Washington County - Superintendent of Schools - Appointment and Reappointment
Top
April 5, 2018
Calendar of Third Reading Senate Bills No. 68
SB 464
Senator Klausmeier
Appropriations
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Report
SB 563
Senator Serafini
Ways and Means
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Application for and Procedure to Claim Credit
SB 564
Senator Serafini
Ways and Means
Income Tax Credit - Security Clearance Costs - Procedure to Claim Credit
SB 1218
Senator Smith
Appropriations
Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Top
April 9, 2018
Message from the Senate: Concurrence Calendar No. 34
House Bills Amended In The Senate
ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION
HB 548
  Calendar No. 104
Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - Requirements
Top
April 9, 2018
Message from the Senate: Concurrence Calendar No. 35
House Bills Amended In The Senate
HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
HB 359
  Calendar No. 98
Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
Top

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


June 19, 2018 3:36 PM