Recent Publication Information

Budget publications created for the fiscal year are organized into the following categories:

"Operating Budget" publications analyze and summarize the state's operating budget, excluding the analysis documents.

"Operating Budget - Analysis Only" publications analyze and summarize the state's operating budget, analysis documents only.

"Capital Budget" publications analyze and summarize the state's capital budget, excluding the analysis documents.

"Capital Budget - Analysis Only" publications analyze and summarize the state's capital budget, analysis documents only.

"Shared Operating and Capital Budget" includes publications that apply to both budgets.

"Spending Affordability" includes publications that have been presented to or produced by the committee.

"Other" budget related publications.


Publications - Fiscal Year 2018





Budget & Fiscal - Capital ▾Published
2017 - Bond Bill FundingThe General Assembly amends the State Capital Budget Bill to specifically list the projects selected for funding instead of acting on individual bond bills. This chart indicates the status of those bond bills funded.04/11/2017
2017 - House Appropriations Committee Reprint of HB151 (Capital Budget)House committee reprint of the capital budget bill which contains the committee amendments.03/18/2017
2017 - Report of the Conference Committee on HB151 - The Capital Budget BillThis is the report of the capital budget conference committee which meets to reconcile the differences between the House and Senate versions of the capital budget bill.03/29/2017
2017 - Report of the House Appropriations Committee - Recommendations, Reductions and Summary of Action Pertaining to HB151 (Capital Budget Bill)Report from the House Appropriations Committee with recommendations, reductions and summary of action pertaining to the capital budget.03/18/2017
2017 - Report of the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee - Recommendations, Reductions and Summary of Action Pertaining to HB151 (Capital Budget Bill)Report from the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee with recommendations, reductions and summary of action pertaining to the capital budget bill.03/23/2017
2017 - Senate Budget and Taxation Committee Reprint of HB151 (Capital Budget)Senate committee reprint of the capital budget bill which contains the committee amendments.03/23/2017
2017 Regular Session - Prior Authorization Web ReportPrior Authorization document listing all projects03/27/2017
2018FY - Operating Budget Analysis - PAY - Capital Budget Fiscal BriefingAn agency-by-agency analysis of the budget submitted by the Governor.02/07/2017