About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published May 2, 2013


May 3 May 6 May 8

Issued: May 3, 2013

MARYLAND COUNCIL FOR EDUCATOR EFFECTIVENESS - Addendum Number: 13-1

   WEDNESDAY   MAY 8, 2013

                                  9:00 A.M.      Room 120
                                     to          House Office Building
                                  12:00 P.M.     6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  To be announced

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Renee Spence, Debra Lichter, or Pat
      Foerster, Maryland State Dept. of Education
              Telephone: 410-767-0469 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         410-974-2597 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: May 6, 2013

HOUSE JUDICIARY - Addendum Number: 13-2

   WEDNESDAY   MAY 8, 2013

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 100
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   This meeting has been canceled

    Subject:  Security in the Baltimore City Detention Center

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Douglas R. Nestor, Lauren C. Nestor, or
      Claire E. Rossmark, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-841-3488 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-858-3488 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: May 8, 2013

MARYLAND COMMUNITY HEALTH RESOURCES COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 13-2

   THURSDAY    MAY 9, 2013

                                  9:30 A.M.      Conference Call

    Subject:  The CHRC will host a conference call for interested applicants to
                provide information on the FY13-FY14-LHIC grants program and
                assistance with the application process

              This call is open to the public

              Dial-in number: 866.247.6034; Conference code: 4102607046

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Maryland Community Health Resources
      Commission
              Telephone: 410-260-7046



May 8, 2013 9:33 A.M.