About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published June 20, 2013


June 20 June 24

Issued: June 20, 2013

MARYLAND VENTURE FUND AUTHORITY - Addendum Number: 13-1

   TUESDAY     JUNE 25, 2013

                                  10:00 A.M.     Conference Call
                                                 Dial-In Number: (866)247-6034
                                                 Conference Code: 2215376115

    Subject:  Update on InvestMaryland Investments
              Decision: New Venture Fund Investment
              Decision: Next Steps For Investing/Monitoring

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Thomas Dann,  Dept. of Business and
      Economic Development
              Telephone: 410-767-6379

Issued: June 24, 2013

TRANSPARENCY AND OPEN GOVERNMENT, JOINT COMMITTEE ON - Addendum Number: 13-1

   WEDNESDAY   JULY 10, 2013

                                  9:30 A.M.      Room 130
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   This meeting has been canceled

    Subject:  Discussion on
               - Improving Navigation of the Maryland General Assembly Website
               - The pros and Cons of the In-person, Electronic Sign-Up for Oral
                   Testimony and Electroic Submittal of Written Testimony
               - Online Tools That Foster Transparency and Open Government

              Public testimony may be given at the end of the meeting. To sign
                up, please email JCTOG@mlis.state.md.us by close of business
                July 9 or sign up in-person before the meeting on July 10

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kathryn Selle or Lisa J. Simpson, Dept. of
      Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

PUB SAF & SCRTY IN ST & LOC CRRCTNL FACS, SP JT COMM - Addendum Number: 13-1

   THURSDAY    JUNE 27, 2013

                                  2:00 P.M.      3 West
                                                 Miller Senate Office Building
                                                 11 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject: The meeting will include an overview of correctional services in
               Maryland by the Department of Legislative Services and the
               Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Chantelle M. Green or Claire E. Rossmark,
      Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)



June 24, 2013 1:48 P.M.