About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published October 31, 2013


November 1

Issued: November 1, 2013

HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS - Addendum Number: 13-1

   WEDNESDAY   NOVEMBER 13, 2013

  Capital Budget Subcommittee
  Delegate Adrienne A. Jones, Chair

                                  3:00 P.M.      University of Maryland
                                                 Baltimore County
                                                 Administration Building
                                                 1000 Hilltop Circle
                                                 Baltimore, MD

    Subject:  Site Visit
              Note: Joint Meeting with the Education and Economic Development
                Subcommittee

  Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
  Delegate John L. Bohanan, Jr., Chair

                                  3:00 P.M.      University of Maryland
                                                 Baltimore County
                                                 Administration Building
                                                 1000 Hilltop Circle
                                                 Baltimore, MD

    Subject:  Site Visit
              Note: Joint meeting with the Capital Budget Subcommittee

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Chantelle M. Green, Kaitlyn Shulman, or
      Kate Henry, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510 (Washington, D.C. Area)

HOUSE HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS - Addendum Number: 13-1

   TUESDAY     NOVEMBER 12, 2013

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 240
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  1. Board of Physician's Reports on Naturopaths and
                   Kinesiotherapists
              2. Board of Nursing Briefing on Nurse Midwife Regulations and on
                   the Study of Professional Midwives

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Linda L. Stahr, Lisa J. Simpson, or
      Erin R. Hopwood, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-841-3770 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-858-3770 (Washington, D.C. Area)

CHILD CUSTODY DECISION MAKING COMMISSION ON, - Addendum Number: 13-1

   THURSDAY    NOVEMBER 7, 2013

                                  6:00 P.M.      Edgewood Hall, Room E132,
                                     to          James LaCalle Lecture Hall
                                  8:00 P.M.      Harford Community College
                                                 401 Thomas Run Road
                                                 Bel Air, MD

    Subject:  One hearing each to be held in Baltimore City, Harford County,
                Prince George's County, Western Maryland and the Eastern Shore
                to allow for public input and participation by interested
                persons on child custody decision making in Maryland

   THURSDAY    NOVEMBER 14, 2013

                                  6:00 P.M.      "Mini Conference Center"
                                     to          in the Fine Arts Wing
                                  8:00 P.M.      Baltimore City Community
                                                 College
                                                 2901 Liberty Heights Avenue
                                                 Baltimore, MD

    Subject:  One hearing each to be held in Baltimore City, Harford County,
                Prince George's County, Western Maryland and the Eastern Shore
                to allow for public input and participation by interested
                persons on child custody decision making in Maryland

   THURSDAY    NOVEMBER 21, 2013

                                  6:00 P.M.      Room HEC110
                                     to          Chesapeake College - Wye Mills
                                  8:00 P.M.      Campus
                                                 1000 College Drive
                                                 Wye Mills, MD

    Subject:  One hearing each to be held in Baltimore City, Harford County,
                Prince George's County, Western Maryland and the Eastern Shore
                to allow for public input and participation by interested
                persons on child custody decision making in Maryland

   WEDNESDAY   DECEMBER 11, 2013

                                  6:00 P.M.      Meeting Room
                                     to          Bowie Library
                                  8:00 P.M.      15210 Annapolis Road
                                                 Bowie, MD

    Subject:  One hearing each to be held in Baltimore City, Harford County,
                Prince George's County, Western Maryland and the Eastern Shore
                to allow for public input and participation by interested
                persons on child custody decision making in Maryland

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Connie Kratovil-Lavelle, Esq., Dept. of
      Family Administration, Admin. Office of the Courts
              Telephone: 410-260-1580
              Email: ChildCustodyDecisionMaking@mdcourts.gov
              Web: http://www.mdcourts.gov/family/cccdm.html



November 6, 2013 3:47 P.M.