About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published November 7, 2013


November 8

Issued: November 8, 2013

REP INDNT CRIM DEFS BY OFC OF THE PUB DEF, TF STDY - Addendum Number: 13-2

   THURSDAY    NOVEMBER 14, 2013

                                  11:00 A.M.     Room 100
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Presentation on a Nationally Validated Risk Assessment Tool by
                Ann Milgram, from the Arnold Foundation. Update from
                subcommittees

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Shirleen M. Pilgrim or Claire E. Rossmark,
      Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

CAPITAL DEBT AFFORDABILITY COMMITTEE - Addendum Number: 13-2

   FRIDAY      NOVEMBER 15, 2013

                                  10:00 A.M.     Assembly Room 114-116
                                                 Louis L. Goldstein Treasury
                                                 Building
                                                 80 Calvert St.
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Purple Line Light Rail Transit Project

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Amber Teitt, State Treasurer's Office
              Telephone: 410-260-7920 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         1-800-974-0468 (Washington, D.C. Area)



November 12, 2013 4:06 P.M.