About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published December 5, 2013


December 9 December 10 December 11

Issued: December 9, 2013

GOVERNOR'S SALARY COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 13-2

   WEDNESDAY   DECEMBER 11, 2013

                                  7:00 P.M.      Room 111
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Discussion of Salary Benefit Compensation Issues

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Steven D. McCulloch or Kate E. Henry, Dept.
      of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: December 10, 2013

MANAGEMENT OF PUBLIC FUNDS, JOINT COMMITTEE ON THE - Addendum Number: 13-2

   TUESDAY     DECEMBER 10, 2013

                                  1:00 P.M.      William H. Amoss Hearing
                                                 Room
                                                 4th Floor
                                                 Miller Senate Office Building
                                                 11 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    NOTE   This meeting has been canceled

    Subject:  Briefing on Oversight and Management of Major State Funded
                Projects:
                - Maryland Stadium Authority
                - Maryland Economic Development Corporation

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Dana K. Tagalicod or Trevor S. Owen, Dept.
      of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

REP INDNT CRIM DEFS BY OFC OF THE PUB DEF, TF STDY - Addendum Number: 13-2


  Courts, Criminal Justice, and Civil Matters
  Gary D. Maynard, Chair

   TUESDAY     DECEMBER 10, 2013

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 100
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    NOTE  This meeting has been canceled

    Subject:  The meeting will include a discussion of recommendations

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Shirleen M. Pilgrim or Claire E. Rossmark,
      Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: December 11, 2013

SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION - Addendum Number: 13-1

   THURSDAY    DECEMBER 12, 2013

                                  9:30 A.M.      3 West
                                                 Miller Senate Office Building
                                                 11 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Committee Retreat
              Topics Include Stormwater Management Fee, Elderly Tax Study,
                Education Update, Revenue Update, and Panel of Maryland Business
                Owners

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Erika S. Schissler, Phillip S. Anthony, or
      Matthew J. Bennett, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5530/5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5530/5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

REP INDNT CRIM DEFS BY OFC OF THE PUB DEF, TF STDY - Addendum Number: 13-2

   THURSDAY    DECEMBER 12, 2013

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 100
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  The Meeting Will Include a Discussion of Recommendations

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Shirleen M. Pilgrim or Claire E. Rossmark,
      Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)



December 11, 2013 12:17 P.M.