About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published May 21, 2015


May 26

Issued: May 26, 2015

HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS - Addendum Number: 15-1

   TUESDAY     JUNE 16, 2015

                                  1:30 P.M.      Room 120
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Joint with the Senate Education, Business, and
                     Administration Subcommittee

    Subject:  Briefing by the Maryland Higher Education Commission on the
              Financial Aid Advisory Council recommended actions and State
              student financial aid programs currently available.

              An overview of recent federal actions on student loan debt will
              also be discussed.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kate Henry, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510 (Washington, D.C. Area)

SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION - Addendum Number: 15-1

   TUESDAY     JUNE 16, 2015

                                  1:30 P.M.      Room 120
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Joint with the House Appropriations Education and Economic
                     Development Subcommittee

    Subject:  Briefing by the Maryland High Education Commission on the
              Financial Aid Advisory Council recommended actions and State
              student financial aid programs currently available.

              An overview of recent federal actions on student loan debt will
              also be discussed.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Erika S. Schissler,
                         Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)

MD UNDERGROUND FACILITIES DAMAGE PREV AUTHORITY - Addendum Number: 15-1

   WEDNESDAY   JUNE 3, 2015

                                  9:00 A.M.      Lower Level Conference
                                                 Room
                                                 One Call Center
                                                 7223 Parkway Drive
                                                 Hanover, MD

    Subject:  Meeting of Full Authority and Hearings

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kevin Woolbright, Damage Prevention
      Authority
              Telephone: 240-205-3684

PUBLIC SAFETY AND POLICING WORKGROUP - Addendum Number: 15-1

   MONDAY      JUNE 8, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 101
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Organizational Meeting

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Shirleen Pilgrim or Claire Rossmark, Dept.
      of Legislative Services
          Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                     301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

SCHOOL CONSTRUCTION, INTERAGENCY COMMITTEE ON - Addendum Number: 15-1

   TUESDAY     JUNE 9, 2015

                                  9:00 A.M.      8th Floor, Conference
                                     to          Room #1
                                 12:00 P.M.      Nancy S. Grasmick Education
                                                 Building
                                                 200 West Baltimore Street
                                                 Baltimore, MD

    Subject:  Regular IAC Meeting

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT: Judith Guenter, Public School Construction
      Program
              Telephone: 410-767-0613
              E-mail: judy.guenter@maryland.gov



May 26, 2015 4:32 P.M.