About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published September 3, 2015


September 4

Issued: September 4, 2015

LEGISLATIVE INFO TECH AND OPEN GOV, JOINT COMM ON - Addendum Number: 15-1

   TUESDAY     SEPTEMBER 8, 2015

                                  2:00 P.M.      Amoss Hearing Room - 4th
                                                 Floor
                                                 Executive Nominations
                                                 Committee
                                                 Miller Senate Office Building
                                                 11 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

  NOTE:  Correction to location of video link - look under Executive Nominations

   To access live video of this meeting:
  1.  On the GAM home page, under the "In Committee" section click the camera
      icon next to Senate
  2.  On the resulting Committee Audio and Video page, look under "other" for
      the Senate Executive Nominations Committee

    Subject:  Organizational meeting and briefing on the Maryland Council on
              Open Data

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kathryn Selle, Dept. of Legislative
      Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

REGULATORY REFORM COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 15-1

   THURSDAY    SEPTEMBER 10, 2015

                                  10:00 A.M.     Mini Conference Center
                                      to         Baltimore City Community
                                   1:00 P.M.     College
                                                 2901 Liberty Heights Avenue
                                                 Baltimore, MD

    Subject:  Regulatory Reform - Regional Meeting

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Christopher Carroll, Governor's Office
              Telephone: 410-974-3336



September 8, 2015 10:08 A.M.