About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published October 8, 2015


October 9 October 13

Issued: October 9, 2015

HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS - Addendum Number: 15-1

   WEDNESDAY   OCTOBER 14, 2015

  EDUCATION AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
  Adrienne A. Jones, Chair

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 130
                                                 Ways and Means Committee
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Joint with Senate Budget and Taxation Subcommittee on
  Education, Business, and Administration

    Subject:  Status of PreK-12 Assessments and Transition

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kate Henry, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510 (Washington, D.C. Area)

SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION - Addendum Number: 15-1

   WEDNESDAY   OCTOBER 14, 2015

  EDUCATION, BUSINESS, AND ADMINISTRATION SUBCOMMITTEE
  Nancy J. King, Chair

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 130
                                                 Ways and Means Committee
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Joint with House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
  and Economic Development

    Subject:  Status of PreK-12 Assessments and Transition

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Erika S. Schissler, Dept. of Legislative
      Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: October 13, 2015

SAFE HARBOR WORKGROUP - Addendum Number: 15-1

   THURSDAY    OCTOBER 15, 2015

                                  1:00 P.M.      Miller Hall
                                                 Trinity Cathedral
                                                 314 North Street
                                                 Easton, MD

    Subject:  Safe Harbor Workgroup established to study Safe Harbor Policy for
              Youth Victims of Human Trafficking. Pursuant to Maryland House
              Bill 456 (Chapter 91)

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Thomas Stack, Governor's Office of Crime
      Control and Prevention
              Telephone: 410-821-2846



October 14, 2015 8:23 A.M.