About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published July 7, 2016


July 8

Issued: July 8, 2016

21ST CENTURY SCHOOL FACILITIES COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 16-1

   THURSDAY    JULY 21, 2016

                                  10:00 A.M.     Room 120
                                                 House Appropriations Committee
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Public testimony will begin about 1:30 p.m. There is
  limited time for public testimony and individuals will be called in the order
  in which they sign up.

    Subject:  Stakeholder Input/Public Testimony

              Members of the public who wish to testify must email
              knott@mlis.state.md.us or call (410) 946-5530 to sign up no later
              than July 15, 2016. Testimony must include recommendations to
              improve public school facilities or the school construction
              process. 75 copies of written testimony must be delivered to Room
              120 House Office Building by 12 noon on July 20, 2016.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Rachel Hise or Kate Henry, Dept. of
      Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510/5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510/5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)



July 12, 2016 8:33 A.M.