About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published September 15, 2016


September 20 September 21

Issued: September 20, 2016

EDUCATION AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT SUBCOMMITTEE - Addendum Number: 16-1

   TUESDAY     SEPTEMBER 27, 2016

                                  12:00 P.M.     Site Visit
                                      to
                                   2:00 P.M.

    NOTE:  Time Change of Site Visit

    Subject:  Site Visit to Morgan State University

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kate Henry, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510/5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510/5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: September 21, 2016

RESTRAINT, SRCHES & NDS CHILD JUV JUS SYS, TASK FRCE - Addendum Number: 16-1

   THURSDAY    SEPTEMBER 22, 2016

                                  10:00 A.M.     Room 150
                                      to         House Rules and Executive
                                  12:00 P.M.     Nominations Committee
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Strip Search Policies and Practices

              Public Testimony

              Department of Juvenile Services Expert Testimony

              Outside Expert Panel Presentation

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Ricardo Flores, Office of the Public
      Defender
              Telephone: 240-388-1561




September 21, 2016 9:20 A.M.