About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published October 13, 2016


October 17 October 18

Issued: October 17, 2016

COMMISSION ON INNOVATION AND EXCELLENCE IN EDUCATION - Addendum Number: 16-1

   MONDAY      OCTOBER 31, 2016

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 120
                                     to          House Appropriation Committee
                                  4:30 P.M.      Room
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Trends in student performance, trends in education spending,
              lessons from top-performing education systems, and implementing
              system reform

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Tiffany Clark or Erika Schissler, Dept of
      Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: October 18, 2016

21ST CENTURY SCHOOL FACILITIES COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 16-2

   THURSDAY    OCTOBER 27, 2016

                                  10:00 A.M.     Room 120
                                      to         House Appropriations Committee
                                   1:00 P.M.     House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  School Construction Methods and Roles of Agencies in IAC
              - Role of Agencies and IAC in School Construction Project
                Review/Decision Process
              - Other States - Program Governance and Structure Options
              - Review of State Procurement and Construction Methods
              - Identifying efficiencies and cost-saving measures for
                construction and maintenance

              Members of the public who wish to testify must email
              KnottCommission@mlis.state.md.us or call (410) 946-5510 to sign up
              no later than October 26, 2016, at 5:00 p.m. There will be limited
              time for public testimony (3 minutes each), and individuals will
              be called to testify in the order in which they sign up. Testimony
              must relate to the agenda topics noted above. 75 copies of written
              testimony must be delivered to Room 120 House Office Building by
              October 26, 2016, at 9:00 a.m.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kate Henry or Rachel Hise, Dept. of
      Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510/5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510/5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)



October 18, 2016 4:21 P.M.