About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published October 27, 2016


October 28 October 31

Issued: October 28, 2016

21ST CENTURY SCHOOL FACILITIES COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 16-2

   THURSDAY    NOVEMBER 10, 2016

                                  10:00 A.M.     Room 120
                                      to         Appropriations Committee
                                   1:00 P.M.     House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject: - Role of Maryland State Department of Education and Interagency
               Committee on School Construction in School Construction Project
               Review/Decision Process

             - Review of Existing and Alternative State Procurement and
               Construction Methods

             Members of the public who wish to testify must email
             KnottCommission@mlis.state.md.us or call (410) 946-5510 to sign up
             no later than November 9, 2016, at 5:00 p.m.  There will be limited
             time for public testimony (3 minutes each), and individuals will be
             called to testify in the order in which they sign up.  Testimony
             must relate to the agenda topics noted above.  75 copies of written
             testimony must be delivered to Room 120 House Office Building by
             November 10, 2016, at 9:00 a.m.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Kate Henry or Rachel Hise, Dept. of
      Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5510/5530 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5510/5530 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: October 31, 2016

HOUSE ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION - Addendum Number: 16-2

   TUESDAY     NOVEMBER 1, 2016

                                  12:00 P.M.     Site Visit

    Subject:  Meeting in Easton, MD

              Tour a poultry farm/ Perdue AgriRecycle and AgriSoil Facilities

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Cristen Flynn, Dept. of Legislative
      Services
              Telephone: 410-841-3990 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-858-3990 (Washington, D.C. Area)



October 31, 2016 3:14 P.M.