About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published April 6, 2017


April 6 April 7 April 8 April 10

Issued: April 6, 2017

SENATE EDUCATION, HEALTH, AND ENVIRONMENTAL AFFAIRS - Addendum Number: 17-51

   ADDED

  HB 1432   Chr HGO           Hlth Care Prvdrs - Prescription Opioids - Limits
            (Dept), et al     on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)
                              APR 6, 2017 1:00 PM

SENATE FINANCE - Addendum Number: 17-46

   ADDED

  HB 869    Del S. Howard,    Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection
            et al             Act
                              APR 6, 2017 1:00 PM

  HB 1002   Del Davis         Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended
                              Funds
                              APR 6, 2017 1:00 PM

  HB 1432   Chr HGO           Hlth Care Prvdrs - Prescription Opioids - Limits
            (Dept), et al     on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)
                              APR 6, 2017 1:00 PM

  HB 1551   Prince            Prince George's County Local Management Board -
            George's County   Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17
            Delegation        APR 6, 2017 1:00 PM

  HB 1619   Del Clippinger    Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and
                              Affiliated Foundations - Establishment
                              APR 6, 2017 1:00 PM

SENATE FINANCE - Addendum Number: 17-47

   CANCELED

  HB 1432   Chr HGO           Hlth Care Prvdrs - Prescription Opioids - Limits
            (Dept), et al     on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)
                              APR 6, 2017 1:00 PM

SENATE JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS - Addendum Number: 17-32

   ADDED

  HB 1428   Chr JUD (Dept)    Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit -
                              Victims' Compensation
                              APR 7, 2017 9:30 AM

HOUSE HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS - Addendum Number: 17-59

   THURSDAY    APRIL 6, 2017

                                  10:00 A.M.

  Updated Time for Health Facilities and
  Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee Work Session:

       - SB 572

                   *Room 240*

Issued: April 7, 2017

HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS - Addendum Number: 17-26

   ADDED

  SB 1027   Sen Manno         Crts - Actn for Vltn of Clctv Bargnng Agrmnt or
                              Breach of Duty of Fair Rprsntn - Lims Period
                              APR 7, 2017 1:00 PM

HOUSE ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION - Addendum Number: 17-45

   ADDED

  SB 1190   Sens Eckardt      Bay Restoration Fund - Upgraded Wastewater
            and Serafini      Facilities - Grants to Counties and Municipalities
                              APR 7, 2017 2:00 PM

HOUSE HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS - Addendum Number: 17-60

   ADDED

  SB 1194   Sen               Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome
            Klausmeier, et    Partnership Fund
            al                APR 7, 2017 1:00 PM

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 17-45

   ADDED

  SB 807    Sen Smith, et     Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified
            al                Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)
                              APR 7, 2017 1:00 PM

  SB 1125   Sen Klausmeier    Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From
                              Gaming Payouts - Expansion
                              APR 7, 2017 1:00 PM

HOUSE RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS COMMITTEE - Addendum Number: 17-3

   ADDED

  HJ 10     Dels Barve and    Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget
            Stein             Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
                              APR 8, 2017 9:30 AM

  SJ 8      Sen Pinsky        Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget
                              Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
                              APR 8, 2017 9:30 AM

HOUSE RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS COMMITTEE - Addendum Number: 17-4

   RESCHEDULED

  HJ 10     Dels Barve and    Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget
            Stein             Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
                              From APR 8, 9:30 AM to APR 8, 10:00 AM

  SJ 8      Sen Pinsky        Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget
                              Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
                              From APR 8, 9:30 AM to APR 8, 10:00 AM

LEGISLATIVE ETHICS, JOINT COMMITTEE ON - Addendum Number: 17-2

   MONDAY      APRIL 10, 2017

                                  9:00 A.M.      Conference Room 206
                                                 Legislative Services Building
                                                 90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Review of Disclosures and Disclaimers

              Work Session

              A portion of the meeting may be closed to comply with a statutory
              requirement that prevents public disclosure of matters that may be
              discussed.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Deadra W. Daly or Stacy M. Goodman,
      Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5200/5350 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-970-5200/5350 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: April 8, 2017

HOUSE HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS - Addendum Number: 17-61

   ADDED

  SB 466    Sen Kagan, et     Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System -
            al                9-1-1 Director's Council (Carl Henn's Law)
                              APR 8, 2017 1:00 PM

HOUSE HEALTH AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS - Addendum Number: 17-62

   ADDED

  SB 1109   Sen Madaleno,     Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services
            et al             Provided
                              APR 10, 2017 1:00 PM

  SB 1196   Sen Middleton     Tri-Co Cncl for Southern Md - Financing Purchase
                              or Lease of Prprty - Exmptn From Procurement Law
                              APR 10, 2017 1:00 PM

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 17-46

   ADDED

  SB 258    Sen Astle         Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police
                              Auxiliaries or Reserve Volunteers
                              APR 8, 2017 2:20 PM

Issued: April 10, 2017

SENATE EDUCATION, HEALTH, AND ENVIRONMENTAL AFFAIRS - Addendum Number: 17-52

   MONDAY      APRIL 10, 2017

                                                       2 West
                                                 Miller Senate Building
                                                 11 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:

  HB 1570 - Time as announced on the Senate Floor

  HB 1600 - Time as announced on the Senate Floor




April 10, 2017 8:45 P.M.