About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published June 8, 2017


June 13 June 14

Issued: June 13, 2017

HOUSE WAYS AND MEANS - Addendum Number: 17-1

   THURSDAY    JUNE 15, 2017

                                  1:00 P.M.      Room 130
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

   NOTE   Subject Update

    Subject:  Organizational Meeting and Briefing by Maryland Stadium Authority
              on Phase I of the Market & Economic Study of the Pimlico
              Racecourse

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Charity Scott, Dept. of Legislative
      Services
              Telephone: 410-841-3469 (Annapolis/Baltimore Area)
                         301-858-3469 (Washington, D.C. Area)

Issued: June 14, 2017

MARYLAND E-NNOVATION INITIATIVE FUND AUTHORITY - Addendum Number: 17-1

   TUESDAY     JUNE 27, 2017

                                  10:00 A.M.     University System of
                                                 Maryland
                                                 University System of Maryland
                                                 Board Room, #G020 in the
                                                 Columbus Center
                                                 701 E. Pratt Street
                                                 Baltimore, MD

   NOTE   Date and Location Change

    Subject:  Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority
              Call-in number: 866-247-6034.  Conference code: 5152674123

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Bret Schreiber, Maryland Dept. of Commerce
              Telephone: 410-767-2368



June 14, 2017 2:56 P.M.