Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending, from January 1, 2020, to January 1, 2022, the termination date applicable to the job creation tax credit program.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {825467/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/27 (Delegate Barron) Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-19)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {825467/1 Adopted 53A
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/27 (Delegate Barron) Adopted 53A
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (119-19) 55
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Referred Rules 57
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM