Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Howard, Saab, Simonaire, McConkey, Kipke, Kittleman, Shoemaker, Metzgar, Buckel, Hornberger, Beitzel, Mautz, Carozza, Krebs, O'Donnell, B. Wilson, Ciliberti, McComas, Szeliga, Jacobs, Chang, Folden, and Carey
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law requiring specified firearms manufacturers and dealers and the Department of State Police to take specified actions relating to identification of handguns; authorizing the Department of State Police to dispose of specified shell casings; and providing the intent of the General Assembly.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0736
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0715 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
9/30/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {142714/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 9/30/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments {142714/1 Adopted 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 70
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM