Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Transportation and Department of the Environment - Purple Line Tree Replacement Plan
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation, in conjunction with the Department of the Environment, to develop a plan to replace trees removed during construction of the Purple Line; requiring the Department of Transportation to consult with businesses, community representatives, local governments, and residents about the plan; requiring the plan to provide for the replacement of trees in areas affected by Purple Line construction with priority given to those with environmental justice issues or the heat island effect; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0359
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Transportation and Department of the Environment - Purple Line Tree Replacement Plan
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/17/2021 1:03 PM