Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Valuation of Residential Real Property - Database
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Afzali, Cluster, Dwyer, Fisher, Frank, George, Glass, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kach, Krebs, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, Norman, Schulz, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Vitale, and Wood
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to maintain a database, available to the public on the Department's Web site, that relates to the valuation of specified real property in the State and includes specified information.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0789 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {525569/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {525569/1 Report Adopted 51
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 53
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 52
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM