Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management Equipment
Sponsored by
Delegates Conway, Afzali, Anderson, Aumann, Barkley, Bates, Beitzel, Bobo, Bohanan, Boteler, Cane, Cardin, Cullison, DeBoy, Donoghue, Dumais, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Feldman, Fisher, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Glass, Griffith, Gutierrez, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hixson, Holmes, Hubbard, Ivey, Jacobs, James, Jones, Kaiser, Kipke, Krebs, Lafferty, Love, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McIntosh, A. Miller, Norman, Otto, Proctor, Ready, S. Robinson, Rudolph, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Stifler, Stocksdale, Summers, Tarrant, Vallario, Vitale, A. Washington, Weir, Wood, George, Harper, Myers, and Stukes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland individual and corporate income tax for specified expenses incurred to buy and install enhanced agricultural management equipment under specified circumstances; defining "enhanced agricultural management equipment"; applying the Act to tax years after December 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0404
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1309 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {965160/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {965160/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 51
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208, 10-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM