Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public Schools
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Afzali, Atterbeary, Barkley, Cassilly, Cullison, Davis, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hill, Hixson, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lisanti, Luedtke, McComas, McCray, McDonough, Metzgar, Moon, Oaks, Pendergrass, Platt, Reilly, Reznik, Shoemaker, Sydnor, Szeliga, Tarlau, Turner, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public Schools; requiring the Commission to make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Commission, on or before July 1, 2016, to report its findings to specified entities; requiring the State Department of Education to survey and assess specified data relating to local, State, and federally mandated assessments; requiring the Department to report specified results to the State Board of Education; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0497
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {335263/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {574331/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {523728/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {335263/2 Report Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {574331/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {523728/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM