Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, D. Barnes, Beidle, Bromwell, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Chang, Cluster, Fennell, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Grammer, Hettleman, Holmes, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jacobs, Jameson, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, O'Donnell, Oaks, Otto, Parrott, Patterson, Proctor, Reilly, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Sophocleus, Szeliga, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vaughn, Vitale, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and Ciliberti
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a tax credit against the State income tax for contributions made to specified student assistance organizations; requiring the Department of Business and Economic Development to administer the tax credit; requiring an entity to submit an application to be a student assistance organization on or before December 1 of each year; establishing the Maryland Education Tax Credit Reserve Fund; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1262 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/10/2015 Text - First - Maryland Education Credit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-205, 10-306, 10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM