Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Anderson, Arora, Aumann, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Bates, Beidle, Bobo, Braveboy, Bromwell, Cardin, Clagett, Clippinger, Cullison, Eckardt, Elliott, Feldman, Frank, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Hough, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Lafferty, Lee, Love, Luedtke, McComas, McDermott, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Schuh, Simmons, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stein, Stocksdale, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Excluding as a father of a child a man who has committed a specified sexual crime against the child's mother for purposes of specified provisions relating to the paternity of a child in a guardianship or adoption proceeding under specified circumstances; requiring a court to consider a specified statement when making a specified finding; prohibiting a court from requiring publication of specified information under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0620
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0815 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-306, 5-3A-06, 5-3B-05, 9-101.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM