Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small Businesses
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission) and Delegates Beitzel, Davis, Jones, Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Barkley, Barron, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Clippinger, Cullison, Fisher, Frick, Glenn, Hammen, Hayes, Hill, S. Howard, Jameson, Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Krebs, Lisanti, Mautz, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pendergrass, Reznik, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Valderrama, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, C. Wilson, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Advisory Council on the Impact of Regulations on Small Businesses in the Department of Business and Economic Development; requiring the Advisory Council to take specified actions and make specified determinations about proposed regulations; requiring the Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission to examine whether the Advisory Council should consider whether a proposed regulation poses a potential unreasonable burden on consumers; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0775
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693997/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {627773/1
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {627773/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senators Conway and McFadden) {473825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {883226/1 Rejected (10-37)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {203920/4 Rejected (10-37)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Delegates Kramer, Fisher, and Davis
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senators Pugh, Middleton, and Jennings
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-3)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {693997/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance 47A
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments {627773/1 51
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 51
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable with Amendments {627773/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Floor Amendment (Senators Conway and McFadden) {473825/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {883226/1 Rejected (10-37) 53
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {203920/4 Rejected (10-37) 53
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5) 53
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Delegates Kramer, Fisher, and Davis 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senate Refuses to Recede 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senators Pugh, Middleton, and Jennings 60
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-3) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 65
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-501 through 3-508 )
(   10-101, 10-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM