Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Gaines, Beidle, B. Barnes, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Clippinger, Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, Frush, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Lafferty, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Platt, B. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, and Waldstreicher
Status
Vote on Veto Special Ordered until 1/31/2017
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board; requiring the Administration to prepare a specified comprehensive multimodal transit development plan; requiring the Administration to establish the Citizens Advisory Council for the Maryland Transit Administration, the MARC Riders Advisory Council for the Maryland Transit Administration, and the Accessible Transportation Advisory Council for the Maryland Transit Administration; requiring the Administration to submit a report to the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0546 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {460910/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-51)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487376/1
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487376/1
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487376/1
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-29)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Motion limit debate (Senator Pugh) Adopted (30-15)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {483521/1 Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (26-19)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-51)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/17 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/24 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/31 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {460910/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (84-51) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Finance 48A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments {487376/1 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments {487376/1 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments {487376/1 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-29) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Motion limit debate (Senator Pugh) Adopted (30-15) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {483521/1 Rejected (17-29) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (26-19) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (87-51) 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/17 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/24 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/31 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-204, 7-205, 7-213, 7-214, 7-215, 7-216 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM