Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm, Afzali, Ciliberti, Folden, Frick, Vogt, K. Young, Hayes, McMillan, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Miele, Saab, Kelly, McDonough, Bromwell, Morgan, Morhaim, Angel, Pendergrass, Hammen, Kipke, Cullison, Sample-Hughes, Barron, Reznik, West, Rose, Hill, and Krebs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators in the Department of Disabilities; establishing the purpose of the Alliance; establishing specified requirements for the Alliance; establishing a Steering Committee for the Alliance; providing funding for the Alliance through appropriations in the annual State budget, grants from federal, State, or local governments, and from any public or private source; providing that the operation of the Alliance is subject to the limitations of the State budget; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {176882/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/09/2015 4/09/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2015 4/09/2015 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments {176882/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-501 through 7-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM