Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Public Officials Charged with or Convicted of a Crime
Sponsored by
Delegates George, Afzali, Arora, Aumann, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Bates, Beidle, Beitzel, Bohanan, Clagett, Donoghue, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, Frush, Glenn, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hough, Ivey, Jacobs, Jameson, Kach, K. Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McMillan, Minnick, Myers, O'Donnell, Olszewski, Otto, Ready, Reznik, Schuh, Serafini, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Vitale, Walker, A. Washington, Weir, Wood, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Public Officials Charged with or Convicted of a Crime; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding the possible forfeiture or suspension of retirement benefits for public officials when charged with or convicted of a criminal act; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before November 30, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0572 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM