Day(s)
As of: 4/18/2024 8:56:26 PM
Canceled
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
University of Baltimore
University of Maryland Baltimore County
Maryland Technology Development Corporation
Created: 2/21/2020 10:28 AM
12:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Canceled
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
MDOT Maryland Transit Administration
Maryland Transportation Authority
Created: 1/17/2020 4:44 PM
12:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/22/2020 7:38 PM)
Created: 2/4/2020 5:17 PM
1:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
12:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings will begin at 12:00 pm or immediately following the Senate floor session.
Sen Kramer
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Nondepository Special Fund
(Added - 2/5/2020 9:07 AM)
(Added - 2/5/2020 9:07 AM)
(Added - 2/5/2020 9:07 AM)
Sen Kramer, et al
Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)
Sen Kramer
Collective Bargaining - Chancellor of the University System of Maryland - Negotiations
Sen Sydnor
Office of Personnel Services and Benefits - Study of Diversity of Employees in State Agencies
(Removed - 2/19/2020 4:23 PM)
Created: 1/29/2020 3:11 PM
12:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings will begin immediately following the Senate floor session.
Sen Carter, et al
Driver's License Suspensions - Failure to Satisfy Judgment - Penalties and Assessment of Points
(Added - 1/30/2020 12:20 PM)
Sen Ready, et al
Drugged Driving - Controlled Dangerous Substance Testing - Authorized Police Officers
(Added - 1/30/2020 12:20 PM)
(Added - 1/31/2020 2:26 PM)
(Removed - 2/6/2020 5:22 PM)
Created: 2/19/2020 3:50 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Update from DPSCS re: Staffing
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/11/2020 6:04 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Del Arentz, et al
State Real Estate Commission - Continuing Education Requirements - Ethics and Professionalism
Del Reilly, et al
Home Builder Registration and Home Improvement Licenses - Professional Education Requirements
Created: 2/3/2020 11:08 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Del Hettleman, et al
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion
(Added - 2/5/2020 1:42 PM)
(Added - 2/5/2020 1:42 PM)
Dels Rosenberg and Stein
Maryland Environmental Policy Act - Consistency With National Environmental Policy Act
Del Malone
State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Vessels Remaining on Private Property
Del Valentino-Smith, et al
Transportation - Private Sector Transportation Projects Ombudsman - Established
(Added - 2/10/2020 9:45 AM)
(Removed - 2/12/2020 11:38 AM)
(Removed - 2/20/2020 5:47 PM)
(Removed - 2/21/2020 11:48 AM)
Created: 2/7/2020 4:52 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Rose, et al
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
Del Malone
Criminal Procedure - Exceptions to the Hearsay Rule - Victim and Witness Intimidation
Del Ciliberti, et al
Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault - Emergency Medical Care Workers
Del Arikan, et al
Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender Registration - Indecent Exposure by Inmate
(Removed - 2/20/2020 6:52 PM)
Created: 2/5/2020 4:31 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Dels Lisanti and P. Young
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Military Retirement Income
(Defense Workforce Opportunity Act)
(Added - 2/5/2020 4:33 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Health and Government Operations)
(Added - 2/6/2020 3:54 PM)
(Added - 2/7/2020 1:31 PM)
(Added - 2/6/2020 3:54 PM)
(Added - 2/6/2020 3:54 PM)
Del Smith, et al
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Transferability, Funding, and Extension (Historic Revitalization Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2020)
(Added - 2/6/2020 3:54 PM)
(Added - 2/6/2020 3:54 PM)
PG Co Deleg and Mont Co Deleg
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Summer Math, Reading, and Science Pilot Program PG/MC 108-20
(Added - 2/7/2020 1:31 PM)
(Added - 2/7/2020 1:33 PM)
Del Ebersole, et al
Income Tax - 529 College Investment Plans - Elementary and Secondary Education Expenses
(Added - 2/7/2020 1:33 PM)
(Removed - 2/7/2020 1:56 PM)
Del Guyton, et al
County Boards of Education - Therapy Dogs - Certification and Use in Schools
(Removed - 2/11/2020 11:27 AM)
Del Grammer
Public Schools - Reporting of Assaults, Crimes of Violence, and Felonies (Report Act of 2020)
(Removed - 2/11/2020 4:12 PM)
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery County Public Schools MC 14-20
(Removed - 2/13/2020 3:35 PM)
Dels Szeliga and Arikan
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Qualified Opportunity Zones
(Removed - 2/14/2020 9:06 AM)
Special Guest: Baltimore City State's Attorney, Marilyn Mosby
Del Attar
Baltimore City - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Registration and License Information
Del Smith, et al
Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Exchange of Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Del Smith
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
Created: 2/19/2020 10:37 AM
Voting Session
10:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Baltimore County Police Chief
Baltimore County Fire Chief
Motorola Solutions
Del Hettleman, et al
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion
Del Grammer
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Del Boteler, et al
Baltimore County Board of Education - Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarships
Del Boteler, et al
Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst
Del Metzgar, et al
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase
Del Johnson, et al
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers and Deputy Sheriffs
Created: 2/17/2020 4:00 PM
2:00 PM to 4:00 PM
-
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM to 4:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Welcome Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Meeting of the Baltimore City Senate Delegation.