Status of LegislationTotal number of Bills: 17
Status as of February 14, 2000: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 13, 2000: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters
Status as of April 25, 2000: Became Law - Chapter 134
Status as of March 3, 2000: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Ways and Means
Status as of March 1, 2000: Bill is in the House - First Reading Environmental Matters
Status as of May 11, 2000: Became Law - Chapter 410
Status as of May 19, 2000: Vetoed by the Governor - Duplicative
Status as of March 21, 2000: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Ways and Means
Status as of March 6, 2000: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters
Status as of May 19, 2000: Vetoed by the Governor - Cross-filed bill was signed
Status as of February 18, 2000: Bill is in the House - First Reading Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 25, 2000: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters
Status as of March 22, 2000: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of May 11, 2000: Became Law - Chapter 279
Status as of March 14, 2000: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings
Status as of March 20, 2000: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Finance