Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries and Farm Breweries MC 18-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a Class 7 micro-brewery in Montgomery County to brew, bottle, or contract for an unlimited number of barrels of malt beverages each year and to sell for on-premises consumption up to 4,000 barrels of beer from each licensed location; authorizing a Class 8 farm brewery to sell certain beer for on-premises consumption and to brew, bottle, or contract for sale an unlimited amount of beer; specifying conditions in which a limited beer wholesaler's license may be issued to a micro-brewery; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries and Farm Breweries MC 18-19
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-102, 25-401, 25-405, 25-407, 25-501, 25-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM