Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation


2009 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 295

File Code: Natural Resources - Generally Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 276
Sponsored By:
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Lafferty, Ali, Barve, Beidle, Cane, Carr, V. Clagett, Feldman, Gaines, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Healey, Howard, Hucker, Lee, Mizeur, Montgomery, and Niemann
Entitled:
Smart, Green, and Growing - Annual Report - Smart Growth Goals, Measures, and Indicators and Implementation of Planning Visions

Synopsis:

Applying provisions concerning a Smart Growth annual report to specified local jurisdictions; requiring local planning commissions to prepare an annual report including Smart Growth goals, measures and indicators on or before July 1 of each year; providing for a statewide land use goal; exempting local jurisdictions that issue fewer than 50 building permits for new residential units per year from specified requirements; authorizing the Department of Planning to adopt specified regulations concerning contents of an annual report; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/29
First Reading Environmental Matters
1/30
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/24
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Special Order 3/28 (Delegate Weldon) Adopted
3/25
Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (45-86)
Special Order later today (Delegate Walkup) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (45-90)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/26
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
4/2
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (123-15)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/28
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Committee Amendment (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/3
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/7
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 179

Sponsored by:

Speaker, The
Administration
Delegate Saqib Ali, District 39
Delegate Kumar P. Barve, District 17
Delegate Pamela Beidle, District 32
Delegate Rudolph C. Cane, District 37A
Delegate Alfred C. Carr, Jr., District 18
Delegate Virginia P. Clagett, District 30
Delegate Brian J. Feldman, District 15
Delegate Tawanna P. Gaines, District 22
Delegate Ana Sol Gutierrez, District 18
Delegate Guy Guzzone, District 13
Delegate Anne Healey, District 22
Delegate Carolyn J. B. Howard, District 24
Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Stephen W. Lafferty, District 42
Delegate Susan C. Lee, District 16
Delegate Heather R. Mizeur, District 20
Delegate Karen S. Montgomery, District 14
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Building Permits
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation
Construction
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Governor
Hearings
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers` Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Planning, Department of
Public Information
Public Works
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
State Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Zoning and Planning

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Article - 66B Land Use
( 1.02 , 2.13 , 3.09 , 3.10 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 343820/02     Offered on: March 28, 2009   at: 3:08 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 550618/01     Offered on: March 27, 2009   at: 11:39 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 793522/01     Offered on: March 28, 2009   at: 1:25 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Senate
Number: 244230/01     Offered on: April 6, 2009   at: 9:44 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 584531/01     Offered on: April 6, 2009   at: 9:42 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 25, 2009: Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {793522/1 Rejected (45-86)
March 25, 2009: Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {343820/2 Rejected (45-90)
March 26, 2009: Third Reading Passed (95-42)
April 2, 2009: Third Reading Passed (123-15)
Senate
April 3, 2009: Third Reading Passed (45-2)