Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation


2010 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 474

File Code: Environment Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 278
Sponsored By:
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Bartlett, Cane, Carr, V. Clagett, Davis, Donoghue, Doory, Frush, Gaines, Hammen, Healey, Jones, Kullen, Lafferty, McIntosh, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Proctor, Ramirez, Rice, and Stein
Entitled:
Smart, Green, and Growing - Maryland Sustainable Growth Commission

Synopsis:

Repealing the Task Force on the Future for Growth and Development in Maryland; establishing the Maryland Sustainable Growth Commission; establishing the membership and the charge of the Commission; authorizing the Commission to adopt rules of procedure; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/29
First Reading Environmental Matters
2/3
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2/26
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/2
Third Reading Passed (110-28)
4/3
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
House Requests Senate Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Delegates Frush, Stein, and O'Donnell
4/8
Returned Passed
Senate Action
3/3
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/3
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
4/9
Motion Recede (Senator Conway) Adopted
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Senate Recede
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/20
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 488

Sponsored by:

Speaker, The
Administration
Delegate Joseph R. Bartlett, District 4A
Delegate Rudolph C. Cane, District 37A
Delegate Alfred C. Carr, Jr., District 18
Delegate Virginia P. Clagett, District 30
Delegate Dereck E. Davis, District 25
Delegate John P. Donoghue, District 2C
Delegate Ann Marie Doory, District 43
Delegate Barbara Frush, District 21
Delegate Tawanna P. Gaines, District 22
Delegate Peter A. Hammen, District 46
Delegate Anne Healey, District 22
Delegate Adrienne A. Jones, District 10
Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B
Delegate Stephen W. Lafferty, District 42
Delegate Maggie McIntosh, District 43
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate James E. Proctor, Jr., District 27A
Delegate Victor R. Ramirez, District 47
Delegate Craig L. Rice, District 15
Delegate Dana Stein, District 11

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condominiums; Mobile Homes
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Planning, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Zoning and Planning

Bill affects the following Statutes:

State Finance and Procurement
( 5-701 , 5-702 , 5-703 , 5-704 , 5-705 , 5-706 , 5-707 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 430414/01     Offered on: February 26, 2010   at: 11:24 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 204537/01     Offered on: April 12, 2010   at: 10:23 p.m.     Status: Withdrawn
Committee Votes :
House
Environmental Matters
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 2, 2010: Third Reading Passed (110-28)
Senate
April 3, 2010: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
April 3, 2010: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
April 9, 2010: Third Reading Passed (47-0)