2004 Regular Session

CHILD CUSTODY

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 8

  • Passed Legislation

    HB 400

    Status as of May 26, 2004: Became Law - Chapter 502

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Dumais and Feldman
    Entitled
    Maryland Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed to Pass

    HB 1092

    Status as of March 22, 2004: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Weldon and Hogan
    Entitled
    Family Law - Children - De Facto Custody
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed to Pass

    HB 1216

    Status as of March 31, 2004: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Delegate O'Donnell
    Entitled
    Child Custody and Visitation - Child Abduction
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed to Pass

    HB 1217

    Status as of March 27, 2004: Bill is in the House - Recommit to Committee Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegate O'Donnell
    Entitled
    Children - Joint Legal Custody and Equal Parenting Time - Preference
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed to Pass

    HB 1276

    Status as of March 22, 2004: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Quinter
    Entitled
    Protective Parent Reform Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Sponsored By
    Senator Grosfeld
    Entitled
    Maryland Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed to Pass

    SB 602

    Status as of March 30, 2004: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Mooney, Brinkley, Hafer, Lawlah, and Munson
    Entitled
    Family Law - Children - De Facto Custody
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed to Pass

    SB 693

    Status as of March 26, 2004: Bill is in the House - First Reading Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Senator Gladden
    Entitled
    Children in Need of Assistance - Custody and Guardianship
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Judiciary